xmlns:atom="http://www.w3.org/2005/Atom"
Aalberts Industries NV, from 25 June 2003 until 1 April 2004,
Aquatis France SAS, from 31 January 1991 until 22 March 2001 (IMI) and from 25 June 2003 until 1 April 2004 (Aalberts),
Simplex Armaturen + Fittings GmbH & Co. KG, from 31 January 1991 until 22 March 2001 (IMI) and from 25 June 2003 until 1 April 2004 (Aalberts),
VSH Italia Srl, from 15 March 1994 until 22 March 2001,
Yorkshire Fittings Limited, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
Advanced Fluid Connections plc, from 23 November 2001 until 1 April 2004,
IBP Limited, from 23 November 2001 until 1 April 2004,
International Building Products France SA, from 4 April 1998 until 23 November 2001 (Delta) and from 23 November 2001 until 1 April 2004 (Advanced Fluid Connections),
International Building Products GmbH, from 31 January 1991 until 23 November 2001,
Delta plc, from 31 December 1988 until 23 November 2001,
Aldway Nine Limited, from 28 July 1999 until 23 November 2001,
Delta Engineering Holdings Limited, from 31 December 1988 until 23 November 2001,
Druryway Samba Limited, from 31 December 1988 until 23 November 2001,
Flowflex Holdings Ltd, from 1 April 1989 until 22 March 2001,
Flowflex Components Ltd, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
FRA.BO SpA, from 30 July 1996 until 1 April 2004,
IMI plc, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
IMI Kynoch Ltd, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
Legris Industries SA, from 31 January 1991 until 1 April 2004,
Comap SA, from 31 January 1991 until 1 April 2004,
Mueller Industries Inc., from 12 December 1991 until 12 December 2000,
Mueller Europe Ltd., from 28 February 1997 until 12 December 2000,
WTC Holding Company, Inc., from 28 February 1997 until 12 December 2000,
Pegler Ltd, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
SANHA Kaimer GmbH & Co. KG, from 30 July 1996 until 22 March 2001,
Kaimer GmbH & Co. Holdings KG, from 30 July 1996 until 22 March 2001,
SANHA Italia srl, from 1 January 1998 until 22 March 2001,
Supergrif SL, from 22 July 1991 until 23 November 2001,
Tomkins plc, from 31 December 1988 until 22 March 2001,
Viega GmbH & Co. KG, from 12 December 1991 until 22 March 2001.
OJ L 1, 4.1.2003, p. 1. Regulation as last amended by Regulation (EC) No 1419/2006 (OJ L 269, 28.9.2006, p. 1).